TN HB0271 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, prohibits the inclusion of a condition precedent for payment clause in construction contracts that precludes a prime contractor from having to pay a remote contractor for services rendered until the prime contractor is paid by the construction owner client. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 6; Title 66, Chapter 11 and Title 66, Chapter 34.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, prohibits the inclusion of a condition precedent for payment clause in construction contracts that precludes a prime contractor from having to pay a remote contractor for services rendered until the prime contractor is paid by the construction owner client. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 6; Title 66, Chapter 11 and Title 66, Chapter 34.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26HouseReturned to the Clerk's Desk.
2019-03-20HousePlaced on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/26/2019
2019-03-19HouseReset on Final cal. of Commerce Committee
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/19/2019
2019-03-12HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Business Subcommittee for 3/12/2019
2019-02-26HouseAction Def. in s/c Business Subcommittee to 3/12/2019
2019-02-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Business Subcommittee for 2/26/2019
2019-02-01HouseAssigned to s/c Business Subcommittee
2019-01-31HouseP2C, ref. to Commerce Committee
2019-01-30HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-29HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0324 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-16 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 2020

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback