TN HB0266 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-21 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, removes the "within 10 days after January 1, 2015" factor from the requirement that each medical practitioner, unless the practitioner meets an exception, must ensure that the undispensed inventory of opioids and benzodiazepines purchased under the prescriber's drug enforcement administration number for dispensing is returned to a licensed third party reverse distributor or turned into local law enforcement. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9; Title 20; Title 33; Title 38; Title 39; Title 47; Title 49; Title 53; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 9; Title 20; Title 33; Title 38; Title 39; Title 47; Title 49; Title 53; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to drugs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-01-21HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2023-01-20HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-19HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0691 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-02 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback