TN HB0266 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 244
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 244
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires a judge, at the time of sentencing, to notify a person convicted of a misdemeanor offense that is eligible for expunction of the person's eligibility to have all public records of the conviction destroyed and the time period after which the person can petition for expunction of the offense. - Amends TCA Title 40.
Title
As enacted, requires a judge, at the time of sentencing, to notify a person convicted of a misdemeanor offense that is eligible for expunction of the person's eligibility to have all public records of the conviction destroyed and the time period after which the person can petition for expunction of the offense. - Amends TCA Title 40.
Sponsors
Rep. Johnny Shaw [D] | Rep. Darren Jernigan [D] | Rep. Harold Love [D] | Rep. Jason Powell [D] |
Rep. John Clemmons [D] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Pub. Ch. 244 | |
2019-05-09 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2019 | |
2019-05-02 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-04-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-23 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-22 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0268) |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-03-28 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-03-28 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 87, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-03-28 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0083) |
2019-03-21 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/28/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/21/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary for 3/13/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/6/2019 |
2019-02-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee to 3/6/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 2/20/2019 |
2019-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee |
2019-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2019-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0778 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 244