TN HB0265 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c TennCare Subcommittee of Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c TennCare Subcommittee of Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, decreases the amount of time an enrollee in the TennCare program has to notify the Bureau of TennCare of any material change to the information provided in the enrollee's application for TennCare benefits from 30 days to 15 days from the material change. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33; Title 56; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, decreases the amount of time an enrollee in the TennCare program has to notify the Bureau of TennCare of any material change to the information provided in the enrollee's application for TennCare benefits from 30 days to 15 days from the material change. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33; Title 56; Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Rep. Bryan Terry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c TennCare Subcommittee of Insurance Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal TennCare Subcommittee for 3/11/2020 |
2019-04-10 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c TennCare Subcommittee of Insurance Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal TennCare Subcommittee for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal TennCare Subcommittee for 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Assigned to s/c TennCare Subcommittee |
2019-03-27 | House | Ref. to Insurance Committee |
2019-01-31 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0286 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee