TN HB0261 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Pub. Ch. 452
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, with certain exceptions, continues permanent rules filed with the secretary of state after January 1, 2016; prohibits the department of revenue from collecting any internet sales or use taxes authorized under Rule 1320-05-01-.129(2) and permitted under a ruling of any court, until such court's ruling has been fully reviewed and the rule has been approved by legislative action. - Title 4, Chapter 5.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, with certain exceptions, continues permanent rules filed with the secretary of state after January 1, 2016; prohibits the department of revenue from collecting any internet sales or use taxes authorized under Rule 1320-05-01-.129(2) and permitted under a ruling of any court, until such court's ruling has been fully reviewed and the rule has been approved by legislative action. - Title 4, Chapter 5.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 73 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 1 BY Goins PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 1 BY Goins PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 51 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 1 BY Goins PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 32 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-01 Pub. Ch. 452
2017-06-01 Effective date(s) 05/25/2017
2017-05-25 Signed by Governor.
2017-05-23HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2017-05-23SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2017-05-18HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2017-05-12HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2017-05-10HouseH. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 73, Nays 7 PNV 1 HB0261
2017-05-09HouseH. Placed on Message Calendar for 5/10/2017
2017-05-09SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2017-05-09SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0546)
2017-05-09SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2017-05-09SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2017-05-09HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2017-05-09HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 86, Nays 3, PNV 0
2017-05-09HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 4 - HA0650)
2017-05-09HouseAm. reconsidered. (Amendment 4 - HA0650)
2017-05-09HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 5 - HA0651)
2017-05-09HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 4 - HA0650)
2017-05-09HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - HA0628)
2017-05-09HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0625)
2017-05-09HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar 2 for 5/9/2017
2017-05-09HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/9/2017
2017-05-09HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2017-05-08HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 5/9/2017
2017-05-08HouseRe-ref. Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-05-08HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0622)
2017-05-03HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/8/2017
2017-05-02HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/2/2017
2017-05-02HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2017-05-01HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-04-26HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations Committee for 5/2/2017
2017-02-02HouseP2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
2017-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2017-01-31HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0053 (Crossfiled) 2017-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 452

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0261&ga=110
Texthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Bill/HB0261.pdf
Texthttp://publications.tnsosfiles.com/acts/110/pub/pc0452.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Amend/HA0622.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Amend/HA0625.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Amend/HA0628.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Amend/HA0650.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Amend/HA0651.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Fiscal/FM1625.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Fiscal/FM1640.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Fiscal/FM1647.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Fiscal/SB0053.pdf
Roll Callhttp://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0261&ga=110

Bill Comments

feedback