TN HB0258 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 43
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 43
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, eliminates the requirement that a governing body of a law enforcement agency responsible for an investigation and arrest resulting in a drug conviction must provide a report to the comptroller regarding funds collected and paid and money spent on drug education and treatment. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-451.
Title
As enacted, eliminates the requirement that a governing body of a law enforcement agency responsible for an investigation and arrest resulting in a drug conviction must provide a report to the comptroller regarding funds collected and paid and money spent on drug education and treatment. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-451.
Sponsors
Rep. David Byrd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 43 | |
2015-03-19 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2015-03-12 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/19/2015 |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/12/2015 |
2015-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/10/2015 |
2015-03-03 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 3/10/2015 |
2015-02-25 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/3/2015 |
2015-02-25 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/25/2015 |
2015-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2015-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2015-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-03 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0420 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-01 - Pub. Ch. 43
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0258&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0258.pdf |