TN HB0258 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-06 - Failed In s/c Conservation Subcommittee of Conservation & Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, extends the wildlife resources commission, June 30, 2012. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 70, Chapter 1, Part 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, extends the wildlife resources commission, June 30, 2012. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 70, Chapter 1, Part 2.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-06 Failed In s/c Conservation Subcommittee of Conservation & Environment Committee
2012-02-29 Placed on s/c cal Conservation Subcommittee for 3/6/2012
2012-02-29 Assigned to s/c Conservation Subcommittee
2012-02-29 Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Conservation & Environment Committee
2012-02-22 Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 2/29/2012
2011-05-11 Action Def. in Government Operations Committee to 2012
2011-05-04 Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 5/11/2011
2011-02-09 P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
2011-02-07 Intro., P1C.
2011-02-03 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0185 (Crossfiled) 2011-05-05 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback