TN HB0254 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, designates the Brian Paul Hotel as a premier type tourist resort for purposes of consumption of alcoholic beverages on the premises. - Amends TCA Section 57-4-102.
Title
As introduced, designates the Brian Paul Hotel as a premier type tourist resort for purposes of consumption of alcoholic beverages on the premises. - Amends TCA Section 57-4-102.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Freeman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | Withdrawn. |
2019-03-20 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Action Def. in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee to 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/13/2019 |
2019-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2019-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1104 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee