TN HB0252 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Effective date(s) 04/28/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Effective date(s) 04/28/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, removes the requirement that a parent-teacher of a home school student provide proof of the student's immunizations and receipt of health services or examinations required by law generally for children in this state to the local education agency; exempts home school students from the immunization requirements applicable to students attending a school, nursery school, kindergarten, preschool, or child care facility; authorizes an LEA, in situations where a home school student participates in an LEA-sponsored interscholastic or extracurricular activity or event, to request and receive proof that the student received a health service or examination that is required for the LEA's students to participate in the activity or event. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 6 and Title 68, relative to home school.
Sponsors
Rep. Jody Barrett [R] | Rep. Elaine Davis [R] | Rep. Kip Capley [R] | Rep. Ed Butler [R] |
Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. Kevin Raper [R] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Rep. Rusty Grills [R] |
Rep. Monty Fritts [R] | Rep. Gino Bulso [R] | Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] | Rep. William Slater [R] |
Rep. Bryan Richey [R] | Rep. Todd Warner [R] | Rep. Jake McCalmon [R] | Rep. Clay Doggett [R] |
Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Greg Vital [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Rick Eldridge [R] |
Rep. Mark Cochran [R] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | Effective date(s) 04/28/2023 | |
2023-05-02 | Pub. Ch. 296 | |
2023-04-28 | Signed by Governor. | |
2023-04-18 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-04-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-04-10 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 25, Nays 5 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0386) |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-03-02 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2023-03-02 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 68, Nays 25, PNV 0 |
2023-03-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-02 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0009) |
2023-02-27 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/2/2023 |
2023-02-27 | House | Reset on cal. for 3/2/2023 |
2023-02-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-23 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/27/2023 |
2023-02-22 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/23/2023 |
2023-02-15 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-08 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 2/15/2023 |
2023-02-07 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2023-02-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 2/7/2023 |
2023-01-24 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2023-01-21 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2023-01-20 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-17 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0644 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 296