TN HB0252 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 243
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 243
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires agencies to ensure the provision of appropriate accommodations in accordance with the Americans with Disabilities Act, if the agency requires a person applying for a license to engage in an occupation, trade, or profession in this state to take an examination; not applicable to an examination mandated and administered pursuant to federal law. - Amends TCA Title 4.
Title
As enacted, requires agencies to ensure the provision of appropriate accommodations in accordance with the Americans with Disabilities Act, if the agency requires a person applying for a license to engage in an occupation, trade, or profession in this state to take an examination; not applicable to an examination mandated and administered pursuant to federal law. - Amends TCA Title 4.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Freeman [D] | Rep. Bill Beck [D] | Rep. Rush Bricken [R] | Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] |
Rep. Dale Carr [R] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Rep. Jim Coley [R] | Rep. John Clemmons [D] |
Rep. Jason Hodges [D] | Rep. Yusuf Hakeem [D] | Rep. Jason Potts [D] | Rep. Brandon Ogles [R] |
Rep. Joe Towns [D] | Rep. Kirk Haston [R] | Rep. Esther Helton-Haynes [R] | Rep. Jerome Moon [R] |
Rep. Karen Camper [D] | Rep. John Windle [D] | Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Pub. Ch. 243 | |
2019-05-09 | Effective date(s) 05/02/2019; 07/01/2020 | |
2019-05-02 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-04-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-23 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-18 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0290) |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0289) |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-16 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-15 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-15 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0246) |
2019-04-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/15/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2019 |
2019-04-08 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/8/2019 |
2019-04-02 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | Action def. in State Committee to 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Action Def. in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee to 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/13/2019 |
2019-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2019-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2019-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0759 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 243