TN HB0252 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, designates the first Saturday of December each year as "The Day to Remember the Battle of Sugar Creek.” - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 1.
Title
As introduced, designates the first Saturday of December each year as "The Day to Remember the Battle of Sugar Creek.” - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Doss [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Failed for lack of second in: State Government Subcommittee |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/25/2015 |
2015-03-11 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/25/2015 |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/11/2015 |
2015-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2015-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2015-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-03 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0313 (Crossfiled) 2015-03-16 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0252&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0252.pdf |