TN HB0251 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Special Educator Scholarship Act." - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to special education.
Sponsors
Rep. Kirk Haston [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-18 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-04-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2023 |
2023-04-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2023-04-17 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/17/2023 |
2023-04-12 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Government Operations Committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 4/12/2023 |
2023-04-05 | House | Action def. in Education Administration to 4/12/2023 |
2023-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 4/5/2023 |
2023-03-29 | House | No Action Taken |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-22 | House | Action def. in Education Administration to 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-15 | House | No Action Taken |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/15/2023 |
2023-03-06 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/6/2023 |
2023-02-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee to 3/6/2023 |
2023-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 2/27/2023 |
2023-01-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee |
2023-01-21 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration -- Government Operations for Review |
2023-01-20 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-17 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1305 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024