TN HB0247 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 38
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, extends the board of chiropractic examiners to June 30, 2021. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 63, Chapter 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, extends the board of chiropractic examiners to June 30, 2021. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 63, Chapter 4.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-11 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 38
2017-03-20HouseComp. SB subst.
2017-03-16HouseH. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/20/2017
2017-03-15HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/16/2017
2017-02-22HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2017-02-15HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations Committee for 2/22/2017
2017-02-02HouseP2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
2017-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2017-01-31HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0056 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-11 - Pub. Ch. 38

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback