TN HB0247 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 360
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, extends the council for hearing instrument specialists, June 30, 2011. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 63, Chapter 17, Part 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, extends the council for hearing instrument specialists, June 30, 2011. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 63, Chapter 17, Part 2.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 2 (Y: 74 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Senate - (VOICE VOTE) FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 2 BY Watson (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-03 Pub. Ch. 360
2011-06-03 Effective date(s) 05/30/11
2011-06-01 Signed by Governor.
2011-05-20 Transmitted to Governor for his action.
2011-05-20 Signed by S. Speaker
2011-05-20 Signed by H. Speaker
2011-05-19 Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2011-05-18 H. concurred in S. am. no. 2 Ayes 74, Nays 23
2011-05-17 H. Placed on Message Calendar 2 for 5/18/2011
2011-05-16 Passed S. as am., Ayes 32, Nays 0
2011-05-16 S. adopted am. 2
2011-05-16 S. Subst. HB for comp. SB.
2011-03-03 Rcvd. from H., P1C.
2011-02-28 Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2011-02-28 Passed H., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 1
2011-02-24 H. Placed on Consent Calendar 1 for 2/28/2011
2011-02-23 Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules for 2/24/11
2011-02-15 Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
2011-02-09 Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 2/15/2011
2011-02-09 P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
2011-02-07 Intro., P1C.
2011-02-03 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0167 (Crossfiled) 2011-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 360

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback