TN HB0246 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires reports of deaths in relation to maintaining voter registration lists to include the date of the death; requires the coordinator of elections to prepare a report for the general assembly regarding deaths of registered voters. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 2, Part 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, Chapter 2, Part 1, relative to maintaining voter registration lists.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | House | Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Government Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-01-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2023-01-21 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2023-01-20 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-17 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0136 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee