TN HB0240 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 01/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 01/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes counties to develop and operate transition centers pursuant to interlocal agreements; authorizes a transition center to partner with a nonprofit organization that provides programming designed to reduce recidivism. - Amends TCA Title 5, Chapter 9, Part 1; Title 49, Chapter 8 and Title 49, Chapter 11.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 5, Chapter 9, Part 1; Title 49, Chapter 8 and Title 49, Chapter 11, relative to programs to reduce recidivism.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 2 (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Effective date(s) 01/01/2022 | |
2021-05-18 | Pub. Ch. 390 | |
2021-05-11 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-05-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-28 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-04-27 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. SA2 Ayes 89, Nays 0 PNV 0 HB0240 |
2021-04-26 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/27/21 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0285) |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0197) |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-04-13 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-04-12 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-04-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-12 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0203) |
2021-04-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/12/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-31 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-02 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee of Education Administration |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/2/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-19 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0489 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 390