TN HB0239 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-01 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-01 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes certain cancer patients to possess and use full extract cannabis oil that is intended to be ingested orally or used topically if certain criteria are met and documentation maintained. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to cannabis oil for medical use.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] | Rep. Darren Jernigan [D] | Rep. Lowell Russell [R] | Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] |
Rep. Mike Carter [R] | Rep. Mike Sparks [R] | Rep. Jason Hodges [D] | Rep. Bill Beck [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-07 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/16/2021 |
2021-03-09 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/16/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/9/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-02 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/9/2021 |
2021-03-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/2/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee-- Criminal Justice |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-19 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1209 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee