TN HB0238 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Held on desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Student Protection and Zone Equity Act." - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4 and Section 49-2-116.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, enacts the "Student Protection and Zone Equity Act." - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4 and Section 49-2-116.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22HouseHeld on desk.
2019-04-18HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019
2019-04-17HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2019
2019-04-17HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-17HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/17/2019
2019-04-17HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-10HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2019
2019-04-10HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-04-10HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-03HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary for 4/10/2019
2019-03-13HouseTaken off notice for cal. in Judiciary
2019-03-06HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary for 3/13/2019
2019-03-06HouseRec. for pass if am. by s/c ref. to Judiciary
2019-02-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/6/2019
2019-02-01HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2019-01-31HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2019-01-30HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-29HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0328 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-16 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee / no second

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback