TN HB0238 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - Held on desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - Held on desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Student Protection and Zone Equity Act." - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4 and Section 49-2-116.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Student Protection and Zone Equity Act." - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4 and Section 49-2-116.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | House | Held on desk. |
2019-04-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-04-10 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary for 4/10/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Judiciary |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary for 3/13/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Rec. for pass if am. by s/c ref. to Judiciary |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/6/2019 |
2019-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2019-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2019-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0328 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-16 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee / no second