TN HB0237 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires a person to obtain an enhanced or concealed handgun permit to carry a handgun in certain counties. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13, relative to firearms.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-21HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
2023-03-16HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/21/2023
2023-03-07HouseReset on Final cal. of Civil Justice Subcommittee
2023-03-01HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/7/2023
2023-02-08HouseAssigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
2023-01-21HouseP2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2023-01-20HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-17HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0010 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-13 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback