TN HB0237 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 473
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 473
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the health services and development agency to June 30, 2018; requires the agency to update sunset review committee of the agency's progress in complying with Chapter 1043 of the Public Acts of 2016. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 68, Chapter 11, Part 16.
Title
As enacted, extends the health services and development agency to June 30, 2018; requires the agency to update sunset review committee of the agency's progress in complying with Chapter 1043 of the Public Acts of 2016. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 68, Chapter 11, Part 16.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-14 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 473 | |
2017-05-10 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2017-05-01 | House | Held on desk. |
2017-04-27 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/1/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/27/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Action def. in Government Operations Committee to 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2017-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0076 (Crossfiled) 2017-06-14 - Pub. Ch. 473