TN HB0236 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-29 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, increases the homestead exemption relative to garnishments; creates homestead exemption for agricultural land; requires the fiscal review committee to recommend to the general assembly every three years suggested increases in the homestead exemption. - Amends TCA Title 26 and Title 30.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, increases the homestead exemption relative to garnishments; creates homestead exemption for agricultural land; requires the fiscal review committee to recommend to the general assembly every three years suggested increases in the homestead exemption. - Amends TCA Title 26 and Title 30.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-29HouseReturned to the Clerk's Desk.
2020-01-22HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary for 1/29/2020
2019-04-10HouseAction def. in Judiciary to First Calendar of 2020
2019-04-03HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary for 4/10/2019
2019-04-02HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary
2019-03-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/2/2019
2019-03-19HouseAction Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 4/2/2019
2019-03-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/19/2019
2019-02-01HouseAssigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
2019-01-31HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2019-01-30HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-29HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0399 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback