TN HB0235 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, increases from $10,000 or more to $25,000 or more, the amount for which a local board of education or the governing body of a public charter school located in a county having a population of 40,000 or more must make purchases or expenditures by competitive bids. - Amends TCA Section 12-3-1212; Section 49-13-111 and Section 49-2-203.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 12-3-1212; Section 49-13-111 and Section 49-2-203, relative to purchasing procedures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2021 | |
2021-05-18 | Pub. Ch. 310 | |
2021-05-04 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-04-27 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-26 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-23 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-04-22 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. SA1 Ayes 86, Nays 0 PNV 0 HB0235 |
2021-04-21 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/22/21 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0227) |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-04-06 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-04-05 | House | Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 5 |
2021-04-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-01 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/5/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/1/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/10/2021 |
2021-03-02 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2021-02-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/2/2021 |
2021-02-23 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration |
2021-02-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 2/23/2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-19 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1125 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 310