TN HB0234 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, declares that a person who holds a valid medical marijuana patient identification card issued by another state does not commit an offense in this state if the person possesses, or distributes to another cardholder, marijuana not in excess of one-half ounce. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, declares that a person who holds a valid medical marijuana patient identification card issued by another state does not commit an offense in this state if the person possesses, or distributes to another cardholder, marijuana not in excess of one-half ounce. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseReturned to the Clerk's Desk.
2019-03-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/3/2019
2019-03-27HouseAction Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 4/3/2019
2019-03-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/27/2019
2019-02-01HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2019-01-31HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2019-01-30HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-29HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0260 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-17 - Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/23/2019

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback