TN HB0231 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 115
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 115
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the state forestry commission four years to June 30, 2021; authorizes the commissioners of environment and conservation and agriculture and the executive director of the Tennessee wildlife resources agency to designate persons to serve in their places as nonvoting members of the state forestry commission. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 11, Chapter 4.
Title
As enacted, extends the state forestry commission four years to June 30, 2021; authorizes the commissioners of environment and conservation and agriculture and the executive director of the Tennessee wildlife resources agency to designate persons to serve in their places as nonvoting members of the state forestry commission. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 11, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 115 | |
2017-03-30 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2017-03-23 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/30/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/23/2017 |
2017-02-22 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 2/22/2017 |
2017-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2017-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0088 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-19 - Pub. Ch. 115