TN HB0229 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-17 - Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-17 - Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits the teaching of or furnishing of materials on human sexuality other than heterosexuality in public school grades K-8. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 10.
Title
As introduced, prohibits the teaching of or furnishing of materials on human sexuality other than heterosexuality in public school grades K-8. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 10.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-17 - House - EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-17 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2012-04-10 | Action Def. in Education Committee to 4/10/2012 | |
2012-04-04 | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 4/10/2012 | |
2012-04-04 | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 4/17/2012 | |
2012-03-13 | Action Def. in Education Committee to Last Calendar | |
2012-03-07 | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/13/2012 | |
2012-02-28 | Action Def. in Education Committee to 3/13/2012 | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 2/28/2012 | |
2012-02-21 | Action Def. in Education Committee to 2/28/2012 | |
2012-02-15 | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 2/21/2012 | |
2012-02-15 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Education Committee | |
2012-02-08 | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 2/15/2012 | |
2012-02-08 | Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 2/15/2012 | |
2012-02-01 | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 2/8/2012 | |
2012-01-18 | Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to Curriculum Calendar | |
2012-01-17 | Sponsor change. | |
2012-01-11 | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 1/18/2012 | |
2011-02-09 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of Education | |
2011-02-09 | P2C, ref. to Education Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-03 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0049 (Crossfiled) 2012-01-10 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.