TN HB0226 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 495
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 495
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes medical laboratory directors to monitor personnel remotely; creates exceptions to the Tennessee Medical Laboratory Act for pharmacies and private laboratories; revises other provisions of the Act. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 68, Chapter 29.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4 and Title 68, Chapter 29, relative to medical laboratories.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 495 | |
2021-05-04 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-05-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-05-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-05-03 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-05-03 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-03-17 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-09 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/9/2021 |
2021-02-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-19 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0982 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-01 - Effective date(s) 05/25/2021