TN HB0225 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 96
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 96
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that local boards of education and governing bodies of public charter schools, as applicable, have the sole authority to open or close schools during a public health emergency; authorizes the board or governing body to delegate that authority to the director of schools or school administrator, as applicable. - Amends TCA Title 49; Title 58 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49; Title 58 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Vaughan [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Tom Leatherwood [R] | Rep. Chris Hurt [R] |
Rep. Ryan Williams [R] | Rep. Dale Carr [R] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] |
Rep. Chris Todd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 96 | |
2021-03-25 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-03-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/25/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/18/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/10/2021 |
2021-03-02 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/2/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-01-19 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0103 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-12 - Effective date(s) 04/07/2021