TN HB0224 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases, from one to three, the minimum number of board members who must be employed, at the time of the appointment, as a K-12 public school teacher, beginning with appointments made on or after January 1, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1.
Title
As introduced, increases, from one to three, the minimum number of board members who must be employed, at the time of the appointment, as a K-12 public school teacher, beginning with appointments made on or after January 1, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2020-01-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 1/21/2020 |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2019-04-02 | House | First Calendar of 2020 |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration Subcommittee for 4/2/2019 |
2019-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration Subcommittee |
2019-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Education |
2019-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0070 (Crossfiled) 2019-01-30 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee