TN HB0223 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee of State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee of State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases from 10 to 15 days the period by which a state agency releasing public records originating in a county assessor's office must notify the county assessor of property of the recipient of the records. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8 and Title 10, Chapter 7.
Title
As introduced, increases from 10 to 15 days the period by which a state agency releasing public records originating in a county assessor's office must notify the county assessor of property of the recipient of the records. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8 and Title 10, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee of State Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee |
2019-03-26 | House | Ref. to State Committee |
2019-01-31 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0434 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee