TN HB0222 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-18 - Assigned to s/c Professional Occupations of HHR
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-18 - Assigned to s/c Professional Occupations of HHR
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the commissioner of human services to report by February 1 of each year to the senate general welfare committee and the house health and human resources committee concerning the amount of sales tax paid by persons using electronic benefit transfer cards. - Amends TCA Title 67 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, requires the commissioner of human services to report by February 1 of each year to the senate general welfare committee and the house health and human resources committee concerning the amount of sales tax paid by persons using electronic benefit transfer cards. - Amends TCA Title 67 and Title 71.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-18 | Assigned to s/c Professional Occupations of HHR | |
2009-02-11 | P2C, ref. to Health & Human Resources | |
2009-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-01-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1356 (Crossfiled) 2010-01-20 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. GW,H&HR Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0222&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB0222.pdf |