TN HB0216 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes a child found to be delinquent to be placed into probation for an indefinite period as long as probation is in the best interest of the child; removes requirement that a court review the case of each delinquent child placed in the department's custody at least every six months; allows child to stay in the department's custody until the necessary treatment or services have been completed. - Amends TCA Title 37; Title 39 and Title 40.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37; Title 39 and Title 40, relative to juveniles.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-04-28HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 5/3/2021
2021-03-24HousePlaced behind the budget
2021-03-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/24/2021
2021-03-17HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2021-03-10HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-03-03HousePlaced on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/10/2021
2021-03-03HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2021-02-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/3/2021
2021-02-24HouseAction Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/3/2021
2021-02-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/24/2021
2021-02-17HouseMeeting Canceled
2021-02-10HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/17/2021
2021-02-10HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2021-02-10HouseP2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2021-02-08HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-01-15HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0206 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback