TN HB0215 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/29/2019
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires local education agencies to develop and implement a "Stop the Bleed" program that requires each school in the LEA to place a bleeding control kit within the school; requires the department of education to develop a bleeding control kit training program for LEA employees. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2 and Title 49, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires local education agencies to develop and implement a "Stop the Bleed" program that requires each school in the LEA to place a bleeding control kit within the school; requires the department of education to develop a bleeding control kit training program for LEA employees. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2 and Title 49, Chapter 6.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/29/2019
2019-04-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/25/2019
2019-04-10HousePlaced behind the budget
2019-04-03HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2019
2019-04-03HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-04-03HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-03-27HousePlaced on cal. Education for 4/3/2019
2019-03-27HouseNo Action Taken
2019-03-20HousePlaced on cal. Education for 3/27/2019
2019-03-20HouseNo Action Taken
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Education for 3/20/2019
2019-03-13HouseNo Action Taken
2019-03-06HousePlaced on cal. Education for 3/13/2019
2019-03-06HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education
2019-02-27HousePlaced on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/6/2019
2019-02-27HouseAction Def. in s/c K-12 Subcommittee to 3/6/2019
2019-02-20HousePlaced on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 2/27/2019
2019-02-01HouseAssigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
2019-01-31HouseP2C, ref. to Education
2019-01-30HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-29HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0259 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-18 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback