TN HB0214 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 290
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 290
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, increases from 5,000 to 25,000 barrels per year the amount of beer that a manufacturer may sell as a retailer; authorizes such a manufacturer to hold license as a hotel, as alternative to holding license as a restaurant, if beer sold on hotel premises. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 5, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, increases from 5,000 to 25,000 barrels per year the amount of beer that a manufacturer may sell as a retailer; authorizes such a manufacturer to hold license as a hotel, as alternative to holding license as a restaurant, if beer sold on hotel premises. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 5, Part 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Harmon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 290 | |
2009-05-18 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2009-05-14 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/18/2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 05/14/2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 05/12/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-05-04 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 05/06/2009 | |
2009-04-30 | Re-referred To: Budget of FW&M | |
2009-04-28 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 04/30/2009 | |
2009-04-28 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 04/28/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on s/c cal Local Government of S&LG for 04/22/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Action Def. in s/c Local Government of S&LG to 4/22/2009 | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on s/c cal Local Government of S&LG for 04/15/2009 | |
2009-02-17 | Assigned to s/c Local Government of S&LG | |
2009-02-11 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government | |
2009-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-01-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0206 (Crossfiled) 2009-06-02 - Pub. Ch. 290
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0214&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB0214.pdf |