TN HB0212 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 299
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 299
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, designates November as "Lung Cancer Awareness Month." - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 1.
Title
As enacted, designates November as "Lung Cancer Awareness Month." - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 299 | |
2015-04-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-13 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2015-04-09 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/13/2015 |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/9/2015 |
2015-04-01 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-24 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-03 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/3/2015 |
2015-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2015-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2015-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-02 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0208 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-06 - Pub. Ch. 299