TN HB0210 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires an LEA to publish its curriculum on the LEA's website and to update curriculum changes at the beginning of each semester. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 2, relative to publishing curriculum.
Sponsors
Rep. Michele Carringer [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R] | Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] |
Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2022 | |
2021-06-01 | Pub. Ch. 519 | |
2021-05-25 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-05-13 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-05-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-05-07 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Conference Committee report adopted, ayes 27, nays 0 |
2021-05-05 | House | Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 85, Nays 0,PNV 0 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed. (Gilmore, Kelsey, White) |
2021-05-05 | House | Conf. comm. appointed Reps. Carringer, Cepicky, Haston, and Windle. |
2021-05-05 | House | H. refused to recede from its non-concurrence SA 1 |
2021-05-05 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 5/5/21 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Senate refused to recede from amendment |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 5/5/2021 |
2021-05-04 | House | H. nonconcurred in S. am. no. SA1 HB0210 |
2021-05-03 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 5/4/21 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0226) |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-03-30 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-03-29 | House | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-03-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-25 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/29/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/25/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on cal. Education Instruction for 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-09 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Instruction |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction Subcommittee for 3/9/2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Instruction |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1147 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 519