TN HB0210 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-14 - Assigned to s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-14 - Assigned to s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, includes preschool programs operated by an LEA for children with disabilities in the programs subject to annual appropriations; directs the commissioner to annually recommend a funding amount per classroom for preschool programs for children with disabilities. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 10; Title 49, Chapter 3 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, includes preschool programs operated by an LEA for children with disabilities in the programs subject to annual appropriations; directs the commissioner to annually recommend a funding amount per classroom for preschool programs for children with disabilities. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 10; Title 49, Chapter 3 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee |
2019-04-02 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Administration Subcommittee to BEP Review Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration Subcommittee for 4/2/2019 |
2019-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration Subcommittee |
2019-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Education |
2019-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0270 (Crossfiled) 2019-01-31 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee