TN HB0207 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-17 - Placed on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 2/24/2021
Pending: House Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee Committee
Hearing: Feb 24 @ 5:00 pm in House Hearing Room III
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, creates a private right of action for owners, assignees, agents, or licensees of commercial recordings or audiovisual works electronically disseminated in violation of the True Origin of Goods Act; clarifies that no criminal penalty is incurred with a violation of the Act. - Amends TCA Title 47.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 47, relative to the True Origin of Goods Act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 2/24/2021
2021-02-09HouseAssigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee
2021-02-08HouseP2C, ref. to Commerce Committee
2021-01-15HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-01-14HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0117 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-23 - Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/2/2021

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback