TN HB0207 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - Pr. Ch. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - Pr. Ch. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to local approval, authorizes possession, storage, use, manufacture, transport, and sale of fireworks in Hawkins County. - Repeals Chapter 617 of the Private Acts of 1947.
Title
As introduced, subject to local approval, authorizes possession, storage, use, manufacture, transport, and sale of fireworks in Hawkins County. - Repeals Chapter 617 of the Private Acts of 1947.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-22 - House - (VOICE VOTE) COMMERCE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-16 - House - (VOICE VOTE) COMMERCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Commerce Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-24 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-22 - House - (VOICE VOTE) COMMERCE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-16 - House - (VOICE VOTE) COMMERCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Commerce Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | Pr. Ch. 5 | |
2011-04-14 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-04-06 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2011-04-06 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-04-05 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-03-31 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2011-03-31 | Passed S., Ayes 30, Nays 0 | |
2011-03-31 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2011-03-31 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2011-03-28 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2011-03-28 | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0 | |
2011-03-24 | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/28/2011 | |
2011-03-23 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/24/2011 | |
2011-03-22 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/22/2011 | |
2011-03-16 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee | |
2011-03-09 | Placed on s/c cal Commerce Subcommittee for 3/16/2011 | |
2011-03-09 | Action Def. in s/c Commerce Subcommittee to 3/16/2011 | |
2011-03-02 | Placed on s/c cal Commerce Subcommittee for 3/9/2011 | |
2011-02-09 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of Commerce | |
2011-02-09 | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-02 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0697 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-28 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 5