TN HB0204 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/27/2019
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires municipalities to contract with a bank for the deposit of municipal funds; requires periodic evaluation of such contracts. - Amends TCA Title 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires municipalities to contract with a bank for the deposit of municipal funds; requires periodic evaluation of such contracts. - Amends TCA Title 6.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/27/2019
2019-03-20HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-03-20HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Local Committee for 3/20/2019
2019-03-06HouseTaken off notice for cal. in Local Committee
2019-02-27HousePlaced on cal. Local Committee for 3/6/2019
2019-02-26HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Committee
2019-02-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 2/26/2019
2019-02-01HouseAssigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee
2019-01-31HouseP2C, ref. to Local Committee
2019-01-30HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-29HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0072 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-28 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback