TN HB0203 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Taken off notice for cal. in Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes the fish and wildlife commission to promulgate rules to create quiet zones on waterways to prohibit disturbance of adjacent residences from 9:00 p.m. to 9:00 a.m. - Amends TCA Title 69, Chapter 9 and Title 70.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 69, Chapter 9 and Title 70, relative to noise levels.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-17HouseTaken off notice for cal. in Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee
2021-03-10HousePlaced on cal. Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee for 3/17/2021
2021-03-09HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee
2021-03-03HousePlaced on s/c cal Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/9/2021
2021-02-09HouseAssigned to s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee
2021-02-08HouseP2C, ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee -- Government Operations for Review
2021-01-15HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-01-14HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0209 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-25 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback