TN HB0202 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Effective date(s) 03/10/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, extends the controlled substance database committee to June 30, 2027. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 53.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 53, relative to the controlled substance database committee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-23 Effective date(s) 03/10/2023
2023-03-23 Pub. Ch. 29
2023-03-10 Signed by Governor.
2023-03-02HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2023-02-28SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2023-02-27HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2023-02-24HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2023-02-23SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2023-02-23SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2023-02-16SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2023-02-14HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2023-02-13HousePassed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
2023-02-09HouseH. Placed on Consent Calendar for 2/13/2023
2023-02-08HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/9/2023
2023-02-06HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2023-02-01HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations Committee for 2/6/2023
2023-01-21HouseP2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
2023-01-20HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-13HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0036 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 29

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback