TN HB0202 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Effective date(s) 05/25/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Effective date(s) 05/25/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires that retirees of the Tennessee highway patrol with 25 years of service receive 80 percent of the scheduled premium or defined contribution for the health insurance benefits provided by the state. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 7 and Title 8, Chapter 27.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 7 and Title 8, Chapter 27, relative to health benefits for retired members of the Tennessee highway patrol.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Effective date(s) 05/25/2021 | |
2021-06-01 | Pub. Ch. 518 | |
2021-05-25 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-05-13 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-05-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-05-06 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-04-27 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-04-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-26 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/27/2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/14/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-03-16 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/16/2021 |
2021-03-09 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 3/16/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/9/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/3/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Action Def. in s/c Public Service Subcommittee to 3/3/2021 |
2021-02-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 2/24/2021 |
2021-02-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2021-02-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 2/17/2021 |
2021-02-09 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee |
2021-02-08 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-01-15 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-14 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1607 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 518