TN HB0202 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 41
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 41
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires online training and continuing education providers for municipal utility board commissioners to provide a certificate of completion or attendance that must be submitted by the commissioner to the municipality upon the completion of required training; requires the municipality to keep the certificate of completion or attendance for six years. - Amends TCA Section 7-34-115.
Title
As enacted, requires online training and continuing education providers for municipal utility board commissioners to provide a certificate of completion or attendance that must be submitted by the commissioner to the municipality upon the completion of required training; requires the municipality to keep the certificate of completion or attendance for six years. - Amends TCA Section 7-34-115.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 41 | |
2019-03-04 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2019-02-28 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/4/2019 |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/28/2019 |
2019-02-26 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 2/26/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Utilities Subcommittee for 2/13/2019 |
2019-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Utilities Subcommittee |
2019-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0430 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-03 - Pub. Ch. 41