TN HB0202 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 160
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 160
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes courts to notify the school of a child who is adjudicated delinquent based on an offense for which school notification is not mandatory under law. - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 1 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As enacted, authorizes courts to notify the school of a child who is adjudicated delinquent based on an offense for which school notification is not mandatory under law. - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 1 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Dunn [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-07 - House - FAMILY JUSTICE OF C&FA: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Children and Family Affairs Committee (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-21 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 160 | |
2009-04-23 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2009-04-21 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/23/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 04/21/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on cal. Children and Family Affairs Committee for 04/15/2009 | |
2009-04-07 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Children and Family Affairs Committee | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on s/c cal Family Justice of C&FA for 04/07/2009 | |
2009-02-24 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Family Justice of C&FA of Children and Family Affairs Committee | |
2009-02-18 | Placed on s/c cal Family Justice of C&FA for 02/24/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to s/c Family Justice of C&FA | |
2009-02-11 | P2C, ref. to Children & Family Affairs | |
2009-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-01-22 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0680 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-21 - Pub. Ch. 160