TN HB0201 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes the sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption at the Historic Jackson Theater, the Jonesborough Repertory Theatre, the International Storytelling Center, the McKinney Center, and the Jonesborough Visitor Center, all located in Jonesborough.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 57-4-102, relative to consumption of alcoholic beverages on premises.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 80 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-11 Signed by Governor.
2021-05-04HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2021-05-03SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-04-30HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-04-28HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2021-04-27SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 26, Nays 0, PNV 3
2021-04-27SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2021-04-14SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2021-04-13HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2021-04-12HousePassed H., Ayes 80, Nays 11, PNV 4
2021-04-08HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/12/2021
2021-04-07HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2021
2021-04-06HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-03-31HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/6/2021
2021-03-31HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-03-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/31/2021
2021-03-23HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2021-03-23HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-03-17HousePlaced on cal. State Government Committee for 3/23/2021
2021-03-16HouseAction def. in State Government Committee to 3/23/2021
2021-03-10HousePlaced on cal. State Government Committee for 3/16/2021
2021-03-09HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
2021-03-03HousePlaced on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/9/2021
2021-02-09HouseAssigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
2021-02-08HouseP2C, ref. to State Government Committee
2021-01-15HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-01-14HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0244 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-27 - Companion House Bill substituted

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback