TN HB0200 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, expands the factors a court may consider in determining whether termination of parental rights is in the best interest of the child; clarifies that the court is not required to consider all factors and may consider relevant factors other than those listed. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 36, Chapter 1, relative to termination of parental rights.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08HouseComp. SB subst.
2021-04-01HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/8/2021
2021-03-31HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/1/2021
2021-03-17HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-03-10HousePlaced on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/17/2021
2021-03-10HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2021-03-03HousePlaced on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/10/2021
2021-02-24HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
2021-02-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 2/24/2021
2021-02-17HouseMeeting Canceled
2021-02-10HousePlaced on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 2/17/2021
2021-02-09HouseAssigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee
2021-02-08HouseP2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2021-01-15HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-01-14HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0205 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-14 - Transmitted to Governor for action.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback