TN HB0200 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 38
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 38
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, reduces, from 25 to 23, the age required for a person to receive an initial school bus endorsement if the person is an honorably discharged veteran of the United States armed forces, a member of the national guard or reserves, or a licensed teacher employed by an LEA. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 55.
Title
As enacted, reduces, from 25 to 23, the age required for a person to receive an initial school bus endorsement if the person is an honorably discharged veteran of the United States armed forces, a member of the national guard or reserves, or a licensed teacher employed by an LEA. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 55.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] | Rep. Sam Whitson [R] | Rep. Timothy Hill [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] |
Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Robin Smith [R] | Rep. Mark Cochran [R] | Rep. Jason Hodges [D] |
Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] | Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R] | Rep. Dan Howell [R] | Rep. Joe Towns [D] |
Rep. Brandon Ogles [R] | Rep. Ryan Williams [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] |
Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 38 | |
2019-03-07 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2019-02-28 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/7/2019 |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/28/2019 |
2019-02-26 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 2/26/2019 |
2019-02-19 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 2/19/2019 |
2019-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee |
2019-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0245 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-03 - Pub. Ch. 38