TN HB0199 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, clarifies that the definition of the practice of nursing does not prevent certain qualified nurses from making determinations that patients are experiencing emergency medical conditions if working in cooperation with a physician and in accordance with hospital protocol. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 7, Part 1 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, clarifies that the definition of the practice of nursing does not prevent certain qualified nurses from making determinations that patients are experiencing emergency medical conditions if working in cooperation with a physician and in accordance with hospital protocol. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 7, Part 1 and Title 68.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseComp. SB subst.
2019-02-28HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/7/2019
2019-02-27HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/28/2019
2019-02-26HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-02-20HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 2/26/2019
2019-02-19HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
2019-02-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee for 2/19/2019
2019-02-12HouseMeeting Canceled
2019-02-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee for 2/12/2019
2019-02-01HouseAssigned to s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee
2019-01-31HouseP2C, ref. to Health Committee
2019-01-30HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-29HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0317 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-20 - Signed by Governor.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback