TN HB0197 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 352
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 352
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes use of cannabidiol oil with less than 0.9 percent of tetrahydrocannabinol to treat intractable seizures or epilepsy in certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4 and Title 43, Chapter 26.
Title
As enacted, authorizes use of cannabidiol oil with less than 0.9 percent of tetrahydrocannabinol to treat intractable seizures or epilepsy in certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4 and Title 43, Chapter 26.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 352 | |
2015-04-13 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2015-04-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-09 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/13/2015 |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/9/2015 |
2015-04-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-01 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-03-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-25 | House | Action def. in Health Committee to 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/25/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Health Committee |
2015-03-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/18/2015 |
2015-03-10 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2015-03-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/10/2015 |
2015-03-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-02-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-02-24 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/10/2015 |
2015-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/24/2015 |
2015-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2015-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee--Health |
2015-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-02-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-01-29 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0280 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-06 - Pub. Ch. 352
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0197&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0197.pdf |